Baker v. McCarley et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Deshawn Baker
Defendant: James Welsh and Kevin McCarley
Case Number: 6:2020cv01169
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (dsg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 6:20-cv-01169-AC. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 7/29/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Form IFP and this Order Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/29/2020.) (joha)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/21/2020.) (joha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker against Kevin McCarley, James Welsh (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brandon Deshawn Baker. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. McCarley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Deshawn Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?