Strategic Benefit Solutions Corporation v. BenefitElect, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Strategic Benefit Solutions Corporation
Defendant: Communication Partners, Inc. and BenefitElect, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01266
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Settlement Conference is SET for Wednesday, November 18, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Portland by video conference before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. Video conference information shall be emailed to the parties the day prior to the conference. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00797-MC, 6:20-cv-01266-MC (pjg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of New Jersey. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #17 . (eo)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (eo)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-14277. Electronic file received.
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #5 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue; ORDERED that this matter SHALL BE transferred to the District of Oregon pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 7/29/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 7/29/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 29, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/17/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/17/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/10/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/10/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/10/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/29/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue (GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by STRATEGIC BENEFIT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. 1 - Declaration of Le Phan, #2 Declaration Ex. 2 - Declaration of Lorena Ahumada, Esq., #3 Declaration Ex. 3 - Declaration of Jeremy Spiegel, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service)(SPIEGEL, JEREMY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/1/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 8/1/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Defendants Withdrawal as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(KRAVETS, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
August 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Withdrawal of Appearance #8 filed by Daniel Kravets was submitted incorrectly using the wrong Notice event. The Clerk will terminate the attorney, but in the future, please file using the correct event "Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case" found under Notices. Using that event will automatically terminate the attorney on the docket once the entry is completed. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL RICHARD KRAVETS on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(KRAVETS, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue . (SPIEGEL, JEREMY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Transfer Venue by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/26/2019. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNICATION PARTNERS, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BENEFITELECT, INC.. (GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMMUNICATION PARTNERS, INC., BENEFITELECT, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-1256-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9771332), filed by COMMUNICATION PARTNERS, INC., BENEFITELECT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strategic Benefit Solutions Corporation v. BenefitElect, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strategic Benefit Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy S. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communication Partners, Inc.
Represented By: CASEY B. GREEN
Represented By: DANIEL RICHARD KRAVETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BenefitElect, Inc.
Represented By: CASEY B. GREEN
Represented By: DANIEL RICHARD KRAVETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?