Young v. Rosenbloom
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Ellen Rosenbloom
Case Number: 6:2020cv01278
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 First Motion for Reconsideration . Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CA Courts Fee Waiver Form FW-001) (Young, Huguette)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Signed on 8/18/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) Modified signature on 8/18/2020 (ck).
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (ck)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff moves to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). Generally, "[t]he clerk of each district court shall require the parties instituting any civil actions... to pay a filing fee." 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) (emphasis added). 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) allows federal courts to authorize commencement of a suit "without prepayment of fees or security therefor, by a person who submits an affidavit" demonstrating "that the person is unable to pay such fees or give security therefor." See Ingle v. Circuit City Stores, Inc., 328 F.3d 1165, 1177 (9th Cir. 2003) (citing 1915 and stating that "plaintiffs in all types of cases may be exempt from paying court fees upon a showing of indigence"). Plaintiff's IFP Application (doc. #1 ) is a three-page narrative that does not provide any information that would allow this Court to assess her ability to pay the filing fee. Without such information, the Court cannot find that paying the filing fee would cause plaintiff undue hardship. Accordingly, plaintiff's IFP Application (doc. #1 ) is DENIED with leave to refile if plaintiff submits financial information as proof of undue hardship. Plaintiff shall submit either an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis or otherwise submit the requisite filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to either pay the filing fee or submit a completed IFP petition within the allotted time may result in entry of a judgment of dismissal. The Clerk is direct to mail plaintiff a copy of the IFP petition form along with a copy of this order. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/4/2020.) (ck)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/3/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/3/2020.) (ck)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/3/2020.) (plb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young against Ellen Rosenbloom. (plb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (plb).
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (plb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Rosenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Rosenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?