Burkhow v. Kelly
Petitioner: Glenn Allen Burkhow and Glenn Allen Burkhow, Jr.
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Case Number: 6:2020cv01319
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies for Claims Based on Conviction by a Non-Unanimous Jury #11 . Petitioner shall file a status report on his state proceedings no later than 3/1/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ps1)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of State Remedies for Claims Based on Conviction by a Non-Unanimous Jury. Filed by Glenn Allen Burkhow, Jr. (Wilk, Susan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Kubernick, Samuel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Susan Wilk is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Glenn Allen Burkhow, Jr. (Wilk, Susan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 10/9/2020. Signed on 8/7/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel #3 is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. Signed on 8/7/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/10/2020.) (Emailed order and petition to FPD.) (dsg)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that petitioners Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 8/7/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/10/2020.) (dsg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/6/2020.) (dsg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Glenn Allen Burkhow. (dsg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Glenn Allen Burkhow against Brandon Kelly. (dsg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Glenn Allen Burkhow. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhow v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn Allen Burkhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn Allen Burkhow, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Susan F. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?