Cascadia Wildlands et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild and Cascadia Wildlands
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management - Oregon and United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor Defendant: Seneca Sawmill Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01395
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of Parker Jones appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jones, Parker)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Doug Heiken . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment #10 .) (Cady, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Ronna Frank. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment #10 .) (Cady, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Courtney Kaltenbach. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment #10 .) (Cady, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Ian Petersen. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment #10 .) (Cady, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cady, Nicholas)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. Nicholas Cady (by telephone) present as counsel for plaintiffs. John Tustin (by telephone) present as counsel for defendant. Sara Ghafouri (by telephone); Lawson Fite (by telephone) present as counsel for intervenor defendant. (FTR - Eugene Courtroom 3) Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (jk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Lodging of the Administrative Record. The administrative record will be separately lodged and is not included in this entry. Filed by United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Maria Vazquez, #2 Exhibit 2 - Administrative Record Index) (Tustin, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Status Conference is set for 10/6/2020 at 10:15AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line. Call-in information will be sent to the parties by e-mail on the day of the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. (jk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Regarding Scheduling and Intervention signed on 9/4/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of John P. Tustin appearing on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Filed by on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management. (Tustin, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Joint Motion for Order Regarding Scheduling and Intervention. Filed by Seneca Sawmill Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fite, Lawson)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/16/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/15/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/15/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7118822 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascadia Wildlands, Oregon Wild against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Cady, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascadia Wildlands et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Wild
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Represented By: Parker Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascadia Wildlands
Represented By: Nicholas Stanton Cady
Represented By: Parker Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management - Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Seneca Sawmill Company
Represented By: Lawson Emmett Fite
Represented By: Sara Ghafouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?