Segura v. Kast et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Segura, Sr.
Defendant: Sgt. Jochums, Sheriff Joe Kast, Deputy Onerdo, Deputy Brazeal, Sgt. Peterson, Sgt. Dunson, Lt. McDaniel, Sgt. Cherno, Sgt. Gemore, Sgt. J. Miller, Tad Larson, Sgt. Davis, Lt. Ramsey, Deputy Kumer and Sgt. Dunbar
Case Number: 6:2020cv01400
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of Juan Castillo. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (joha)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of Christopher L. Ciampi. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of William Gentry. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Steven Collier. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Stanislav Bakanov. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of Shawn Lee. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Michael Day. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 Declaration of Martin Kirk Varela. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Josh Petty. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Jose Juan G Arzola-Ortega. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration of Jacob Daniel Anderson. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Herman Sampson Jr.. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Athan Cunningham. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Gregorio Mondragon. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (dsg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Omar E Rivera Agular. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Marcio Gaitan. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Wesley J. Thomas. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of Travis Johnson. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Kyle Cantwell. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Matt Martinez. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Nicholas Brown. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (joha)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (dsg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/18/2020.) (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr against Brazeal, Cherno, Davis, Dunbar, Dunson, Gemore, Jochums, Joe Kast, Kumer, Tad Larson, McDaniel, J. Miller, Onerdo, Peterson, Ramsey (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits 1-85, #3 Exhibits 86-152). (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Pedro Segura, Sr. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura v. Kast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jochums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Onerdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Brazeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Cherno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Gemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Segura, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?