Brown v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv01430
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Original Complaint attached to Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Bennett, John)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 9/28/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Bennett, John) Modified on 9/1/2020 to create document link. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (bd)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/19/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/19/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Bennett, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of John A. Bennett in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Bennett, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv25096 from Multnomah Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7136184 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action Proceedings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bennett, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Represented By: Robert E.L. Bonaparte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Richard Williams
Represented By: John A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?