Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC et al v. Go Farm Hemp LLC et al
Plaintiff: Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC and W. John Short
Defendant: John Joseph Sager, JP Consulting LLC, Go Farm Hemp LLC, YCG Holdings LLC and Paul Smith
Case Number: 6:2020cv01634
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration of Josh Escovedo) (Escovedo, Joshua)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 as to Josh H. Escovedo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service upon Go Farm Hemp LLC served on 10/19/2020 [Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Assignment Order; and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order] Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stadtler, Joshua)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service upon Paul Smith served on 10/19/2020 [Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Assignment Order; and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order] Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stadtler, Joshua)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service upon YCG Holdings LLC served on 10/19/2020 [Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Assignment Order; and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order] Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stadtler, Joshua)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service upon JP Consulting LLC served on 10/19/2020 [Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Assignment Order; and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order] Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stadtler, Joshua)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service upon John Joseph Sager served on 10/19/2020 [Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Assignment Order; and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order] Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stadtler, Joshua)
October 21, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 7308590 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Josh H. Escovedo. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 7308590. Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short. (ecp)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Josh H. Escovedo is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 .) (ck)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to YCG Holdings LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Smith. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Joseph Sager. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to JP Consulting LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Go Farm Hemp LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to John Joseph Sager Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Paul Smith Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to JP Consulting LLC Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to YCG Holdings LLC Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Go Farm Hemp LLC Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/18/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/18/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC. (Stadtler, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7259806 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC, W. John Short against Go Farm Hemp LLC, JP Consulting LLC, John Joseph Sager, Paul Smith, YCG Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5). (Stadtler, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC et al v. Go Farm Hemp LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Wuf Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Joshua D. Stadtler
Represented By: Joshua Heath Escovedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. John Short
Represented By: Joshua D. Stadtler
Represented By: Joshua Heath Escovedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Farm Hemp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YCG Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?