Linn County v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Linn County
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 6:2020cv01889
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 as to Ronald G. London. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Service by Linn County of Complaint, #1 U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr Filed by Linn County. (London, Ronald)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Service by Linn County of Complaint, #1 U.S. Attorney District of Oregon Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 as to Ronald London. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7545647. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
November 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ronald G. London. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7533921 #9 , Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7545647 #10 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service of Proposed Summons #3 upon United States Forest Service served on 11/10/2020 Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7545647. Filed by Linn County. (London, Ronald)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Ronald G. London is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 .) (ck)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ronald G. London. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7533921. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States Department of Justice Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Ellen F. Rosenblum, Attorney General Department of Justice Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons United States Forest Service - Pacific NW Region Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons United States Department of Agriculture Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons United States Forest Service Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Federal Freedom of Information Act Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7443437 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Linn County against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (DiLorenzo, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linn County v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linn County
Represented By: John A. DiLorenzo, Jr.
Represented By: Evan R. Christopher
Represented By: Christopher J.K. Swift
Represented By: Aaron K. Stuckey
Represented By: Ronald Gary London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?