Yocum v. Hendricks
Plaintiff: Derald D. Yocum
Defendant: Kimberly Hendricks, Nurse Greg McNabb, C/O Watkins and C/O Fonseca
Case Number: 6:2020cv01923
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp, Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel #5 sent to Derald D. Yocum returned as undeliverable. (dsg)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO AMEND: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is DENIED with leave to renew at a later stage of the proceedings. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to do so will result in dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 12/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/15/2020.) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/6/2020.) (dsg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Derald D. Yocum. (dsg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Derald D. Yocum against Kimberly Hendricks. (dsg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Derald D. Yocum. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yocum v. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Greg McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Fonseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derald D. Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?