Yela Fiduciary Services, LLC et al v. Benton County et al
Plaintiff: Yela Fiduciary Services, LLC and Emery Sund
Defendant: Benton County, Evan Mohr, Lance Loberg, Paul Lancaster, Callie Dugger, Jon Sobotka, Matthew Blackshear, Jonathan Herrick, Nicholas Miller, Thomas White, Melissa Werdell, Scott Jackson, Ethan Garrison, Doree Johnson, Tanner Sparks, Diana Rabago, Nicole Kelley, John Does 1-9, Jon Sobotka, M.D. and Lance Loberg, M.D.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01925
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 64 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 18, 2020 Filing 63 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lance Loberg, M.D. waiver sent on 12/16/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 18, 2020 Filing 62 Affidavit of Service upon Jon Sobotka, M.D. served on 12/14/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 11, 2020 Filing 61 Declaration of Darian Stanford in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #60 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stanford, Darian)
December 11, 2020 Filing 60 Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #57 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 8, 2020 Filing 59 Corrected Affidavit of Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 8, 2020 Filing 58 Declaration of Gerald L. Warren . Filed by Benton County, Matthew Blackshear, Callie Dugger, Ethan Garrison, Jonathan Herrick, Scott Jackson, Doree Johnson, Paul Lancaster, Lance Loberg, M.D., Nicholas Miller, Evan Mohr, Diana Rabago, Jon Sobotka, M.D., Tanner Sparks, Melissa Werdell, Thomas White. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition, #57 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Warren, Gerald)
December 8, 2020 Filing 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Jon Sobotka, M.D., Doree Johnson, Matthew Blackshear, Paul Lancaster, Callie Dugger, Melissa Werdell, Nicholas Miller, Scott Jackson, Thomas White, Benton County, Jonathan Herrick, Evan Mohr, Diana Rabago, Tanner Sparks, Lance Loberg, M.D., Ethan Garrison. (Warren, Gerald)
December 7, 2020 Filing 56 Affidavit of Service upon Benton County served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 55 Affidavit of Service upon Melissa Werdell served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 54 Affidavit of Service upon Scott Jackson served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 53 Affidavit of Service upon Callie Dugger served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 52 Affidavit of Service upon Evan Mohr served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 51 Affidavit of Service upon Nicholas Miller served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 50 Affidavit of Service upon Paul Lancaster served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 49 Affidavit of Service upon Ethan Garrison served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 48 Affidavit of Service upon Doree Johnson served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 47 Affidavit of Service upon Thomas White served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 46 Affidavit of Service upon Tanner Sparks served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 45 Affidavit of Service upon Matthew Blackshear served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 44 Affidavit of Service upon Jonathan Herrick served on 12/1/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Willes, Michael)
November 24, 2020 Filing 43 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Benton County, Scott Jackson, Lance Loberg, M.D., Jon Sobotka, M.D. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons Jon Sobotka, #2 Amended Summons Lance Loberg, #3 Amended Summons Scott Jackson) (jw)
November 23, 2020 Filing 42 Affidavit of Service upon Diana Rabago served on 11/19/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 23, 2020 Filing 41 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Nicole Kelley waiver sent on 11/10/2020. Filed by Nicole Kelley. (Franz, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 40 Amended Proposed Summons for Scott Jackson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 39 Amended Proposed Summons for Lance Loberg Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 38 Amended Proposed Summons for Jon Sobotka Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 37 Amended Proposed Summons for Benton County Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 36 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lance Loberg, M.D. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jon Sobotka, M.D. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nicole Kelley. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Jackson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Issued Electronically as to Evan Mohr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Issued Electronically as to Melissa Werdell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew Blackshear. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 29 Summons Issued Electronically as to Callie Dugger. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ethan Garrison. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jonathan Herrick. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Issued Electronically as to Doree Johnson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Lancaster. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nicholas Miller. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tanner Sparks. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued Electronically as to Thomas White. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Summons - Lance Loberg Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Summons - Jon Sobotka Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Summons - Nicole Kelley Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Summons - Scott Jackson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Summons - Evan Mohr Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Summons - Melissa Werdell Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Summons - Matthew Blackshear Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons - Callie Dugger Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons - Ethan Garrison Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons - Jonathan Herrick Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons - Doree Johnson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons - Paul Lancaster Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons - Nicholas Miller Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons - Tanner Sparks Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons - Thomas White Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Diana Rabago. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Benton County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/9/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stanford, Darian)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7462825 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Yela Fiduciary Services, LLC, Emery Sund against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stanford, Darian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yela Fiduciary Services, LLC et al v. Benton County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Mohr
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Loberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lancaster
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callie Dugger
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Blackshear
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Herrick
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Miller
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas White
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Werdell
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jackson
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Garrison
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doree Johnson
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Sparks
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Rabago
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Kelley
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sobotka, M.D.
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Loberg, M.D.
Represented By: Gerald L. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yela Fiduciary Services, LLC
Represented By: Kalia Walker
Represented By: Michael C. Willes
Represented By: Darian A. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emery Sund
Represented By: Kalia Walker
Represented By: Michael C. Willes
Represented By: Darian A. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?