Powell v. McClure
Plaintiff: Jon Paul Powell
Defendant: Deputy McClure
Case Number: 6:2020cv01933
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Powell to submit $400.00 or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 12/22/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut.(Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 12/22/2020.) (dsg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Jon Paul Powell. (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/9/2020.) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Jon Paul Powell against McClure. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Paul Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?