Davis v. Kelly
Petitioner: Michael Davis
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Case Number: 6:2020cv01969
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (Death Penalty)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Oliver W. Loewy is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Michael Davis. (Loewy, Oliver)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of re-mailing Case Reassignment Notice #6 to Michael Davis. (pvh)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Reassignment Notice #6 sent to Michael Davis returned as undeliverable. (sss)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Association of Attorney Timothy A. Sylwester,Timothy A. Sylwester,Timothy A. Sylwester for Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Sylwester, Timothy)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Ryan Kahn is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Kahn, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Michael Davis served on 11/19/2020, answer due on 1/19/2021 Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Signed on 11/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is DENIED AS MOOT.Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel #3 is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. Signed on 11/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/19/2020.)(Emailed order and petition to FPD.) (dsg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ann L. Aiken to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/19/20.) (eo)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/16/20.) (eo)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/13/2020.) (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Michael Davis. (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Michael Davis against Brandon Kelly. (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michael Davis. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Timothy A. Sylwester
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Ryan P. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Davis
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Oliver W. Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?