Angus v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Joanna Angus
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2020cv01975
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Stephania C. Denton appearing on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America Filed by on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Denton, Stephania)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/15/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Aaron I. Engle. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7491772. Filed by Joanna Angus. (Engle, Aaron)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 11/13/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Joanna Angus against Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Langer, Frederick) Modified on 11/13/2020 to indicate Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7491395. (jw)
November 13, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Aaron I. Engle. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7491772 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angus v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Represented By: Stephania C. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Angus
Represented By: Frederick P. Langer
Represented By: Aaron I. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?