Blackstrap Industries, Inc. v. Bullex Logistics et al
Plaintiff: Blackstrap Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Bullex Logistics, HNRY Logistics, Inc. and DBX Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv02148
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Complaint #10 . Response is due by 2/19/2021. Motion is taken under advisement as of 3/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se parties on 2/2/2021.) (ck)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Blackstrap Industries, Inc.. (Davidson, Larry)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Complaint #10 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Blackstrap Industries, Inc.. (Davidson, Larry)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Oral Argument requested. Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Deana S. Stein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7614367 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Answer is due by 1/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/14/2020.) (ck)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/11/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 12/11/2020.) (ck)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 12/11/2020.) (ck)
December 11, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marc S. Blubaugh. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7615140 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
December 11, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Deana S. Stein is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 .) (ck)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/10/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/10/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se parties Bullex Logistics and DBX Logistics, Inc. on 12/10/2020.) (jw)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Marc S. Blubaugh. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7615140. Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc.. (Payne, Martha)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Deana S. Stein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7614367. Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc.. (Payne, Martha)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc.. (Payne, Martha)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv40958 from Oregon Circuit Court for County of Deschutes. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7612480 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by HNRY Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Complaint, #3 Exhibit B: Summons, #4 Exhibit C: Notice to State Court). (Payne, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackstrap Industries, Inc. v. Bullex Logistics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullex Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNRY Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Martha J. Payne
Represented By: Marc S. Blubaugh
Represented By: Deana S Stein, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBX Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackstrap Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Larry R. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?