Grove v. SACE Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Grove
Defendant: Timothy L. Williams, SACE Inc., Shayne Olsen, Molly Brundage and Pamela A. Williams
Case Number: 6:2020cv02253
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 , Summons Issued #11 , Complaint, #1 , Summons Issued #9 on Shayne Olsen served on 1/22/2021; Sace Inc. served on 1/22/2021 on Defendants SACE Inc. and Shayne Olsen Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Timothy L. Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sace Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pamela A. Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Shayne Olsen. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Molly Brundage. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons on Pamela A. Williams Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons on Timothy L. Williams Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons on Molly Brundage Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons on Shayne Olsen Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons on SACE Inc. Filed by David Grove. (Haynie, Erick)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/27/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/27/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/27/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7683251 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by David Grove against Molly Brundage, Shayne Olsen, SACE Inc., Pamela A. Williams, Timothy L. Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (Haynie, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grove v. SACE Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SACE Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayne Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Grove
Represented By: Erick J. Haynie
Represented By: Tamara E. MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?