Blanscet v. Oregon Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: William Blanscet
Defendant: Oregon State Penitentiary, Does 1 through 3, Dr. Paulson Reed, Oregon Department of Corrections and M.D. Reed Paulson
Case Number: 6:2021cv00301
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Oregon State Penitentiary served on 4/14/2021 Filed by William Blanscet. (Lafky, Kevin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Oregon Department of Corrections served on 4/14/2021 Filed by William Blanscet. (Lafky, Kevin)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Reed Paulson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon State Penitentiary. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Department of Corrections. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) Filed by William Blanscet. (Lafky, Kevin)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/28/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/26/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/26/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (bd)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7945003 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by William Blanscet against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lafky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanscet v. Oregon Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Blanscet
Represented By: Kevin T. Lafky
Represented By: Amanda Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Paulson Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Reed Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?