Hickson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Hickson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Barclays Bank Delaware, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00370
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #18 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 22, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8053552 #18 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
April 22, 2021 Filing 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8053552. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #15 . Answer is due by 5/20/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 . JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association's Answer is due by 5/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Bank of America, N.A. served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Barclays Bank Delaware waiver sent on 3/16/2021. Filed by Theresa Hickson. (Schumacher, Kyle)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Barclays Bank Delaware. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/9/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/12/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7988804 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Theresa Hickson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha K. Sondag
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hickson
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?