Makela v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trisha Makela
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and TD Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00386
Filed: March 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 5/11/2021. Filed by Trisha Makela. (Schumacher, Kyle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 Declaration of Brian T. Kiolbasa . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #18 .) (Kiolbasa, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss . Oral Argument requested. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
April 26, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8055337 #14 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Motion to Amend Caption #7 . Signed on 4/23/2021 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 .Experian's Answer is due by 5/20/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Answer is due by 5/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8055337. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 admission requested by attorney Brian Melendez. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion to Amend Caption. Filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dazer, Nicholas)
April 13, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian Melendez. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8036562 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brian Melendez. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8036562. Filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Court Admissions) (Melendez, Brian)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to TD Bank USA, N.A. served on 3/30/2021, answer due on 4/20/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, and TD Bank USA, N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons JP Morgan, #2 Summons TD Bank) (jw)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/13/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw)
March 14, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7989798 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Trisha Makela against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makela v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Makela
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Melendez
Represented By: Nicholas L. Dazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?