Graham v. Highberger
Petitioner: Clifford Joe Graham
Respondent: Joshua Highberger
Case Number: 6:2021cv00390
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Joshua Highberger. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Joshua Highberger. Filed by Joshua Highberger. (Larsen, Lynn)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 6/4/2021. Signed on 4/5/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (Order Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/5/2021.) (joha)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This Court denies Graham's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ), with leave to renew after Respondent files an answer and responsive brief or if the Court schedules an evidentiary hearing. Signed on 4/5/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/5/2021.) (joha)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Petitioner's amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #7 ). The Petitioner may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 4/5/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/5/2021.) (joha)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Clifford Joe Graham. (joha)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court DENIES Petitioner's application. Petitioner may file an amended application curing this deficiency within thirty days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Case No. 6:21-cv-00390-IM. Petitioner is advised that the failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to forward to Petitioner a form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed on 3/16/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Order and IFP Form Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/16/2021.) (joha)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/15/2021.) (dsg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Clifford Joe Graham. (dsg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Clifford Joe Graham against Joshua Highberger. (dsg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Clifford Joe Graham. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Highberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Joe Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joshua Highberger
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?