Fuller Business Funding LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Fuller Business Funding LLC and Fuller Business Funding, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00794
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT signed on 7/8/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: As per the parties' Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #7 ), this action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), without leave to amend, with waiver by each party of any right to appeal the dismissal, and with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines, hearings, and any trial date are stricken. (jk)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Turpen, Kjersten)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 7/13/2021 at 09:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns. People appearing before this Court may do so in writing and when appearing for conferences, hearings or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. All parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those pronouns previously identified. (jk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order signed on 5/25/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Turpen, Kjersten)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Turpen, Kjersten)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv36843 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8093905 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Turpen, Kjersten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller Business Funding LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuller Business Funding LLC
Represented By: Clark E. Rasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuller Business Funding, LLC
Represented By: Clark E. Rasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kjersten H. Turpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?