Silver Mountain Development, Inc. v. City of Silverton
Plaintiff: Silver Mountain Development, Inc.
Defendant: City of Silverton
Case Number: 6:2021cv00809
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 8/24/2021 at 09:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns. People appearing before this Court may do so in writing and when appearing for conferences, hearings or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. All parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those pronouns previously identified. (jk)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by City of Silverton. (Piscadlo, Bradley)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jw)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 7/16/2021. (jk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon City of Silverton served on 5/26/2021 Filed by Silver Mountain Development, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Responsive Pleading, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by City of Silverton. (Piscadlo, Bradley)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order signed on 5/27/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Silverton. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/23/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Silver Mountain Development, Inc.. (Emerick, Hunter)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8096620 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Silver Mountain Development, Inc. against City of Silverton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Emerick, Hunter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Mountain Development, Inc. v. City of Silverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Silverton
Represented By: Bradley F. Piscadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Mountain Development, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Brooks Emerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?