Stross v. John Hyland Const., Inc
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: John Hyland Const., Inc
Case Number: 6:2021cv01070
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding Bond, Civil Cover Sheet #3 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Extra event was selected during docketing. The following corrections were made to the record: The Bond event was inadvertently selected during docketing. The clerk has corrected the docket text and the Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (bd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (bd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Hyland Const., Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/17/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/17/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 12/17/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Bond posted. , Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to John Hyland Const., Inc. Filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Dukelow, Owen)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. for Copyright Infringement Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8161828 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VAu 1-103-498--Alex Stross Photographs Dec 2008 - April 2010--Alexander Bayonne Stross, dba Stross Arts. Filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross against John Hyland Const., Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 Example of Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 Demand Letter). (Dukelow, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. John Hyland Const., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: Owen Warner Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hyland Const., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?