Carr v. City of Springfield, et al.
Plaintiff: Ashley Leann Carr
Defendant: Joseph Burke, City of Springfield and Officer Joseph Burke
Case Number: 6:2021cv01402
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Franz, Jr appearing on behalf of Joseph Burke. Filed by Joseph Burke. (Franz, Robert)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joseph Burke waiver sent on 10/12/2021. Filed by Joseph Burke. (Henderson, Sarah)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by City of Springfield waiver sent on 10/8/2021. Filed by City of Springfield. (Armosino, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Springfield. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph Burke. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons BURKE Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Michaels, Brian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Michaels, Brian)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Filing Fee in amount of $402.00 collected; Receipt No. 13960 issued. (bd)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ashley Leann Carr against Joseph Burke, City of Springfield (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Michaels, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. City of Springfield, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Leann Carr
Represented By: Brian L. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield
Represented By: Thomas F. Armosino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joseph Burke
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah R. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?