Nottingham v. Allen
Plaintiff: James Nottingham
Defendant: Larry Landers and Patrick Allen
Case Number: 6:2021cv01420
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 Amended Complaint. Filed by James Nottingham against Patrick Allen. (dsg) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/22/2021) (dsg).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Appointing Michael Thomas Burleson for James Nottingham as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 12/1/2021. Signed on 11/17/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/17/2021.) (dsg)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Terminating Heather Van Meter as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 11/17/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/17/2021.) (dsg)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because Counsel is unable to assist Plaintiff on this case based on counsel's preliminary review of applicable law and plaintiff's likelihood of success on the merits. . Filed by James Nottingham. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #10 .) (Van Meter, Heather)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Appointing Heather Van Meter for James Nottingham as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 11/23/2021. Signed on 11/9/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/9/2021.) (dsg)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Terminating Matthew J. Steven as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 11/9/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/9/2021.) (dsg)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because Insufficient capacity . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #7 .) (Steven, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Appointing Matthew J. Steven for James Nottingham as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 11/22/2021. Signed on 11/8/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/8/2021.) (dsg)
November 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO DISMISS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint #2 is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. In order to proceed with this action, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above within 30 days of either: (1) the date pro bono counsel accepts representation; or (2) if the Court is unable to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in this case, the date on which the Court advises Plaintiff that he must proceed pro se. Signed on 11/7/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/8/2021.) (dsg)
November 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's provisional in forma pauperis status is CONFIRMED. IT IS ORDERED that the Lincoln County Sheriff or the Sheriffs designee shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 11/7/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party and Lincoln County Sheriff on 11/8/2021.) (dsg)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 09/28/2021.) (bd)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint, in Forma Pauperis Pending. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Nottingham against Larry Landers. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Summons (Incomplete).) (No Civil Cover Sheet submitted.) (bd)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James Nottingham. (Attachments: #1 Attachment.) (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nottingham v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nottingham
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burleson
Represented By: Heather Van Meter
Represented By: Matthew J. Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?