Ramirez v. Shrigley et al
Plaintiff: Hilaria Ramirez
Defendant: Perry Shrigley and Perry Shrigley Trucking LTD
Case Number: 6:2021cv01428
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Notice Of Death of Plaintiff Filed by Hilaria Ramirez. (Mahady, Scott)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference by telephone. Exchange of Expert Witness Disclosures must be completed by 5/8/2022. Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures must be completed by 5/27/2022. Discovery is to be completed by 7/8/2022. Expert Discovery to be completed by 7/8/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/8/2022. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 8/8/2022. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/24/2022 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. An estimated four-day (4) Jury Trial is set for 11/7/2022 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. Scott Mahady present as counsel for plaintiff. Ross Van Ness present as counsel for defendants. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (jk)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/2/2021 at 10:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the Court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns. People appearing before this Court may do so in writing and when appearing for conferences, hearings or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. All parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those pronouns previously identified. (jk)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. (Related Doc. Notice of Removal #1 .) Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Perry Shrigley Trucking LTD, Perry Shrigley. (Wess, Tessan) Modified on 10/6/2021 to create document link and update docket text. NEF not regenerated. (bd)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order signed on 9/29/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/26/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/25/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/25/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Perry Shrigley Trucking LTD. (Wess, Tessan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV15473 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8248551 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Perry Shrigley Trucking LTD, Perry Shrigley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Register of Actions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wess, Tessan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Shrigley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilaria Ramirez
Represented By: Scott J. Mahady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Shrigley
Represented By: Tessan Wess
Represented By: Ross C. Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Shrigley Trucking LTD
Represented By: Tessan Wess
Represented By: Ross C. Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?