Thornton v. Smart et al
Plaintiff: Brian Thornton
Defendant: Matt Smart, Tom Beck, Jon Zwemke, James Hixenbaugh and City of Reedsport
Case Number: 6:2021cv01509
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Jon Zwemke, James Hixenbaugh. (Reese, Lucas)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines #10 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/1/2022. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements must be completed by 8/15/2022. Expert Discovery to be completed by 9/15/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 12/1/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Brian Thornton. (Burrows, Michelle)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 . Answer is due by 12/17/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Luke W. Reese in Support of MOET - Responsive Pleading. Filed by James Hixenbaugh, Jon Zwemke. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #7 .) (Reese, Lucas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Jon Zwemke, James Hixenbaugh. (Reese, Lucas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by City of Reedsport, Tom Beck, Matt Smart. (Campbell, Andrew)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon All Defendants Filed by Brian Thornton. (Burrows, Michelle)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tom Beck, #2 Summons Jon Zwemke, #3 Summons James Hixenbaugh, #4 Summons City of Reedsport) (jw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 10/15/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/14/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 3/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8271493 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Brian Thornton against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Burrows, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Smart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thornton
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Smart
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Beck
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Zwemke
Represented By: Lucas W. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hixenbaugh
Represented By: Lucas W. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Reedsport
Represented By: Andrew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?