Doe v. Oregon State University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Oregon State University, Board of Trustees of Oregon State University, Kimberly Kirkland, Carol Millie, Beverly Russell, Rebecca Johnson and Edward Feser
Case Number: 6:2021cv01541
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 32 Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. Filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #28 admission requested by attorney Tara J. Davis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #27 as to Regina M. Federico. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #26 admission requested by attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 12/21/2021 to correct attorney, resent NEF(cp).
December 21, 2021 Filing 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tara J. Davis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350754. Filed by John Doe. (Davis, Tara) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text entered by attorney, resent NEF(cp).
December 21, 2021 Filing 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Regina M. Federico. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350746. Filed by John Doe. (Federico, Regina) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text entered by attorney and resent NEF(cp).
December 21, 2021 Filing 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350665. Filed by John Doe. (Miltenberg, Andrew) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text entered by attorney and resent NEF (cp).
December 21, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Regina M. Federico. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350746 #27 ; Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Tara J. Davis. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350754 #28 ; Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8350665 #26 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck)
December 20, 2021 Filing 25 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Beverly Russell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 Amended Proposed Summons to Beverly Russell Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 23 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Rebecca Johnson waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 22 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Oregon State University waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 21 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kimberly Kirkland waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Edward Feser waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 19 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Carol Millie waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of Oregon State University waiver sent on 11/1/2021. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Kevin William Roberts appearing on behalf of John Doe. Filed by John Doe. (Roberts, Kevin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Beverly Russell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon State University. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Carol Millie. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kimberly Kirkland. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rebecca Johnson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Edward Feser. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Board of Trustees of Oregon State University. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/22/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/24/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 3/24/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons Kimberly Kirkland Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Edward Feser Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Rebecca Johnson Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Carol Millie Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Beverly Russell Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Board of Trutees OSU Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Oregon State University Filed by John Doe. (Sammons, Anna)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Demand for Jury Trial Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8281921 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by John Doe against Board of Trustees of Oregon State University, Edward Feser, Rebecca Johnson, Kimberly Kirkland, Carol Millie, Oregon State University, Beverly Russell (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet). (Sammons, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Oregon State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Anna Sammons
Represented By: Andrew Miltenberg
Represented By: Kevin William Roberts
Represented By: Regina Marie Federico
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Oregon State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Millie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Feser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?