Reinhart v. Landstar Ranger, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dann Reinhart
Defendant: Landstar Ranger, Inc. and Lloyd Theen
Case Number: 6:2021cv01598
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #7 . Filed by Dann Reinhart. (Walsh, Joseph)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #7 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Dann Reinhart. (Walsh, Joseph)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Dann Reinhart. (Walsh, Joseph)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 Amended Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Williams, Brian)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 11/3/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Brian B. Williams in Support of Notice of Removal #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian) Modified on 11/2/2021 to add document link. Notice of Electronic Filing regenerated to the parties. (jw)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV32569 from Deschutes County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8292936 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Lloyd Eugene Theen, Landstar Ranger, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Williams, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhart v. Landstar Ranger, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dann Reinhart
Represented By: Joseph S. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Tomas Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Theen
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Tomas Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?