Andrade v. Mosaic Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Arryin Andrade
Defendant: Mosaic Management Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01632
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of the Service of Summons. Filed by Arryin Andrade. (Weiner, Jon) Modified on 12/2/2021 to add docket text to reflect title of document. NEF not regenerated. (jw)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order signed on 11/22/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/10/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/11/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/11/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Arryin Andrade. (Weiner, Jon)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8300977 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Arryin Andrade against Arryin Andrade. (Weiner, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrade v. Mosaic Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arryin Andrade
Represented By: Jon H. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?