Olson-Ivie et al v. Florence Lighthouse Inn et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Olson-Ivie and Scott Ivie
Defendant: Florence Lighthouse Inn and Eric Johnson
Case Number: 6:2022cv00689
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Defendants. (Walkup, Amanda)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Amanda Marie Walkup appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Florence Lighthouse Inn, Eric Johnson. (Walkup, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #5 upon All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leiman, Alan)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/11/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leiman, Alan)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Eric Johnson) (jw)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/8/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/11/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/11/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leiman, Alan)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Leiman, Alan)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8513025 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lisa Olson-Ivie, Scott Ivie against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Leiman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson-Ivie et al v. Florence Lighthouse Inn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Olson-Ivie
Represented By: Alan J. Leiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ivie
Represented By: Alan J. Leiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Lighthouse Inn
Represented By: Amanda Marie Walkup
Represented By: Elizabeth Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Walkup
Represented By: Elizabeth Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?