Reichman et al v. CDR Maguire Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Reichman and Brett Michael Bitney
Defendant: CDR Maguire Inc. and CDR Maguire, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00734
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #11 . Amended Complaint is due 7/27/2022. Answer is due by 8/10/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time To File Amended Complaint and Response. Filed by All Defendants. (Choi, Edward)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #8 . Amended Complaint is due by 7/6/2022. Answer is due by 7/20/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance Filed by CDR Maguire, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer OR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT. Filed by CDR Maguire, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Justin Prato. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8531333. Filed by Brett Michael Bitney, Daniel Reichman. (Prato, Justin)
May 26, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Justin Prato. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8531333 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to CDR Maguire, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/19/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/17/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/17/2022. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cullen, Paul)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/19/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8523550 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Brett Michael Bitney, Daniel Reichman against CDR Maguire Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cullen, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reichman et al v. CDR Maguire Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Reichman
Represented By: Paul T. Cullen
Represented By: Justin Prato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Michael Bitney
Represented By: Paul T. Cullen
Represented By: Justin Prato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDR Maguire Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDR Maguire, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?