Climate Protection and Restoration Initiative et al v. Regan et al
Plaintiff: Climate Protection and Restoration Initiative, Climate Science, Awareness and Solutions, Donn J. Viviani, John Birks, Richard Heede, Lise Van Susteren and James E. Hansen
Defendant: Michael S. Regan and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 6:2022cv01772
Filed: November 12, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galpern, Daniel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galpern, Daniel)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding the JS44 civil coversheet attached to #1 Complaint. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties.. (sss)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/14/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/13/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 4/13/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Management Order signed on 11/14/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
November 12, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8720463 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Lise Van Susteren, Donn J. Viviani, Climate Science, Awareness and Solutions, John Birks, Climate Protection and Restoration Initiative, Richard Heede against Michael Regan, US Environmental Protection Agency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TSCA 21 Petition for Rulemaking, #2 Exhibit EPA Denial of Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Galpern, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Climate Protection and Restoration Initiative et al v. Regan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Climate Protection and Restoration Initiative
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Climate Science, Awareness and Solutions
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donn J. Viviani
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Birks
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Heede
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lise Van Susteren
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Hansen
Represented By: Daniel M. Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?