Stapleton v. Katstrike, Inc.
Defendant: David P. Stapleton and Katstrike, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00097
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: The parties' Stipulated Motion to Consolidate Related Cases #16 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The motion is DENIED with respect to consolidation with Stapleton v. Twenty-Two Shoes LLC 6:24-cv-00066-AA. The motion is GRANTED with respect to consolidation of the following cases for the purpose of the pending motions to remand only: Stapleton v. Just My Kicks, LLC 6:24-cv-0056-MK (ECF No. 9); Stapleton v. Idanks LLC 6:24-cv-00085-MK (ECF No. 11); and Stapleton v. Katsrike Inc. 6:24-cv-00097-MK (ECF No. #10 ). LR 42-3(7) (cases may be consolidated for purposes of a motion). Following resolution of the Motion to Remand to State Court #10 , the cases will be unconsolidated for all further proceedings. (jk)
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 Reply to Defendants' Consolidated Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 Oral Argument requested. Filed by David P. Stapleton. (Larsen, Daniel)
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 Stipulated Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. Filed by David P. Stapleton. (Larsen, Daniel)
February 27, 2024 Filing 15 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 . Filed by Katstrike, Inc.. (Rusk, Justin)
February 21, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE BY THE CLERK: A dispositive motion has been filed in this case. Currently there is not full consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in this case. If the non-consenting party or parties would like to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the consent form may be found on the court's website at #ord.uscourts.gov/civil-forms and may be filed electronically by using the Consent event under Other Filings/Consent in the Civil menu or delivered to the Clerk's Office by mail or in person. The form is also attached to this docket entry. For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see #ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed on or before the date briefing on the dispositive motion is complete. (jk)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 is due on 2/27/2024. Plaintiff's Reply is due on 3/12/2024. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 14 days following this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 . (jk)
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 . Filed by Katstrike, Inc.. (Rusk, Justin)
February 13, 2024 Filing 11 Declaration of David P. Stapleton in Support of Receiver's Motion for Remand. Filed by David P. Stapleton. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #10 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Larsen, Daniel)
February 13, 2024 Filing 10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by David P. Stapleton. (Larsen, Daniel)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Related Cases Filed by Katstrike, Inc.. (Rusk, Justin)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 requested by attorney Oren Bitan. (jk)
February 1, 2024 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Oren Bitan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9258908 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jw)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Oren Bitan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9258908. Filed by David P. Stapleton. (Bitan, Oren)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/21/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/20/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/20/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Answer is due by 2/22/2024. (jk)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Katstrike, Inc.. (Rusk, Justin)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order signed on 1/19/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Katstrike, Inc.. (Rusk, Justin)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV50111 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9238415 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Katstrike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Rusk, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stapleton v. Katstrike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Stapleton
Represented By: Daniel P. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katstrike, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Lee Hoffman
Represented By: Justin T. Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?