Nemeth v. Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC) et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Trish Nemeth
Defendant: Corey Fhuere, Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC), Oregon State Penitentiary (OSP), D. Wilson, Richard Pardilla (MD), Ka Rin Johnson LCSW, QMHP, Bernadette Louise Huard, MD, Dr. Don Dravis, Arma Ybarra (MSW, QMHP), Jessica Rausin (MS, QMHP), Tabitha Drago, R.N., Officer Michael Praska, Corporal Dustin Johnson, Officer Holly Burghardt, Officer Travis Banning, Officer Nick Martin, Lieutenant Paul Wright, Officer J. McKinney, K. Van Houten, Officer Alex Wagner, Officer D. Smith and Dr. Rebecca Millius
Case Number: 6:2024cv01355
Filed: August 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Appear and File Responsive Pleading, ECF #9 . Defendants' waiver of service and appearance is due by October 28, 2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 26, 2024 Filing 10 Declaration of Nathaniel Aggrey . Filed by Travis Banning, Holly Burghardt, Corey Fhuere, Tabitha Drago, R.N., Don Dravis, Dustin Johnson, Ka Rin Johnson LCSW, QMHP, Nick Martin, J. McKinney, Rebecca Millius, Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC), Oregon State Penitentiary (OSP), Michael Praska, Jessica Rausin (MS, QMHP), D. Smith, K. Van Houten, Alex Wagner, D. Wilson, Paul Wright, Arma Ybarra (MSW, QMHP). (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time, #9 .) (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
September 26, 2024 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Travis Banning, Holly Burghardt, Corey Fhuere, Tabitha Drago, R.N., Don Dravis, Dustin Johnson, Ka Rin Johnson LCSW, QMHP, Nick Martin, J. McKinney, Rebecca Millius, Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC), Oregon State Penitentiary (OSP), Michael Praska, Jessica Rausin (MS, QMHP), D. Smith, K. Van Houten, Alex Wagner, D. Wilson, Paul Wright, Arma Ybarra (MSW, QMHP). (Aggrey, Nathaniel) Modified on 9/27/2024 to correct event. (mja). Modified on 9/27/2024 (mja).
August 28, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #6 Amended Complaint. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An incorrect PDF was attached to the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
August 26, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC), Rebecca Millius. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rebecca Millius) (jw)
August 23, 2024 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Patricia Trish Nemeth against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Lamb, Wayne) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/28/2024) (cw).
August 23, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #1 Complaint (Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
August 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Travis Banning, Holly Burghardt, Corey Fhuere, Tabitha Drago, R.N., Don Dravis, Bernadette Louise Huard, MD, Dustin Johnson, Ka Rin Johnson LCSW, QMHP, Nick Martin, J. McKinney, Oregon State Penitentiary (OSP), Richard Pardilla (MD), Michael Praska, Jessica Rausin (MS, QMHP), K. Van Houten, Alex Wagner, D. Wilson, Paul Wright, Arma Ybarra (MSW, QMHP). NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Arma Ybarra, #2 Summons Bernadette Louise Huard, #3 Summons Corey Fhuere, #4 Summons D. Wilson, #5 Summons Dr. Don Dravis, #6 Summons Dustin Johnson, #7 Summons Holly Burghardt, #8 Summons J. McKinney, #9 Summons Jessica Rausin, #10 Summons K. Van Houten, #11 Summons Ka Rin Johnson, #12 Summons Michael Praska, #13 Summons Nick Martin, #14 Summons Oregon State Penitentiary, #15 Summons Paul Wright, #16 Summons Richard Pardilla MD, #17 Summons Tabitha Drago, #18 Summons Travis Banning) (jw)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/19/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/21/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 1/21/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jw)
August 19, 2024 Filing 2 A duplicate payment in the amount of $405.00 was submitted by Patricia Nemeth, Estate of Jesse Banks in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court's website. Refund Request is Due 8/29/2024. (nd)
August 18, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9537148 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Patricia Nemeth, Estate of Jesse Banks against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Lamb, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemeth v. Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Fhuere
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Corrections (ODOC)
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Penitentiary (OSP)
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Wilson
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pardilla (MD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ka Rin Johnson LCSW, QMHP
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Louise Huard, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Don Dravis
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arma Ybarra (MSW, QMHP)
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Rausin (MS, QMHP)
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha Drago, R.N.
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Praska
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Dustin Johnson
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Holly Burghardt
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Travis Banning
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nick Martin
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Paul Wright
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. McKinney
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Van Houten
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alex Wagner
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer D. Smith
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Rebecca Millius
Represented By: Nathaniel Aggrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Trish Nemeth
Represented By: Wayne A Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?