Clack v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Helen Margaret Clack
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2025cv00103
Filed: January 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Christopher Vieira appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Vieira, Christopher)
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Susanne Luse appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Luse, Susanne)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . (gm)
January 21, 2025 Filing 4 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (le)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (le)
January 20, 2025 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Helen Margaret Clack. (Kerr, Kevin)
January 20, 2025 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Plaintiff consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Filed by Helen Margaret Clack against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 5/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clack v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Margaret Clack
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Susanne Luse
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?