Reed v. Miller, et al
Plaintiff: Danni Noel Reed and Sonia Camille Roberson
Defendant: Rex Miller, Agri Tech Design and Farmers Insurance Commercial Claims
Case Number: 6:2025cv00261
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this action is DISMISSED. Signed on 3/10/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/10/2025.) (ck)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint #2 is DISMISSED and Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is DENIED. Signed on 3/10/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/10/2025.) (ck)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Danni Noel Reed. (sss)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for Claim Preclusion. Filed by Danni Noel Reed. (jw)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/20/2025.) (le)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Danni Noel Reed. (le)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Danni Noel Reed against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (le)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Danni Noel Reed. (le)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Miller, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danni Noel Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Camille Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Tech Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Commercial Claims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?