REVAK et al v. LOCATUM A.B. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT REVAK and MARGARET REVAK
Defendant: INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Cross_claimant: INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Cross_defendant: W. GIERSTEN, MARLING LEEK, LTD., LOCATUM A.B. and INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Case Number: 2:2003cv04822
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY EXPERT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/9/2009. 9/10/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ap, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRELUDE EVIDENCE OF ALCOHOL CONSUMPTION BY PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/8/2009. 9/9/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ap, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/19/09. 5/20/09 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/14/2009. 5/15/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ap, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REVAK et al v. LOCATUM A.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT REVAK
Represented By: STANLEY B. GRUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET REVAK
Represented By: STANLEY B. GRUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Represented By: JOHN T. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Represented By: JOHN T. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: W. GIERSTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MARLING LEEK, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: LOCATUM A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: INTERFOREST TERMINAL UMEA AB
Represented By: JOHN T. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?