GROSSMAN et al v. MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. et al
Case Number: 2:2003cv05336
Filed: September 23, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: LEGROME D. DAVIS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER THAT THE SITTHIDETHS'S MOTION (DOC. NOS. 1009, 1013) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/28/16. 3/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 3/28/2016 (lisad, ).
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DELOITTE'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE FROM TRIAL ANY TESTIMONY FROM LEAD PLAINTIFFS' PURPORTED EXPERT CHAD COFFMAN IS DENIED. COFFMAN WILL BE PERMITTED TO TESTIFY AT TRIAL AS AN EXPERT ON LOSS CAUSATION AND DAMAGES CONSISTENT WITH THE OPINIONS SET FORTH IN HIS REPORTS DATED 10/1/2008, 12/17/2008 AND 6/24/2013. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/15/14. 9/16/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER THAT LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP'S PURPORTED CAUSATION AND DAMAGES EXPERT NEIL H. DEMCHICK IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/18/13. 11/19/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DELOITTE & TOUCHE, LLP MAY SUBSTITUTE AN EXPERT WITNESS TO REPLACE ITS FORMER EXPERT MR. TERRY MUSIKA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/19/13. 2/20/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TERRY CADY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR O DEFENDNAT TERRY CADY AND AGAINST LEAD PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST ALL MEMBERS OF THE PLAINTIFF CLASS OF INVESTORS IN DIAGNOSTIC VENTURES, INC. AS TO ALL CLAIMS CONTAINED IN THE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/22/13. 1/23/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DELOITTE & TOUCHE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CERTIFY QUESTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT DELOITTE & TOUCHE'S MOTION TO CERTIFY QUESTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/4/13. 1/4/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROSSMAN et al v. MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?