GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY v. FIRST STATE INSURANCE CO. et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv03509
Filed: July 23, 2004
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Referring Judge: LINDA K. CARACAPPA
Presiding Judge: EDMUND V. LUDWIG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 694 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (DOC. 686 ) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF GRC, AND AGAINST DEFENDANT TRAVELERS, IN THE AMOUNT OF $21 MILLION U.S. DO LLAR. PREJUDGMENT INTEREST IS AWARDED IN ADDITION TO THE STIPULATED DAMAGES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. A TOTAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF GRC AND AGAINST DEFENDANT TRAVELERS IN THE AMOUNT OF $36,273,705.00 U.S. DOLLARS. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED AND TERMINATED, AND TO REMOVE THIS ACTION FROM THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 9/9/2015. 9/9/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 12, 2015 672 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE PRESENTATION OF EVIDENCE (DOC. 651 ) IS DENIED. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/11/2015. 6/12/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 1, 2015 665 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIF FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE OF DAMAGES (DOC. 649 ) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT AT THE TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 6/15/2015 DEFEDANT TRANVELERS WILL NOT BE PERMITTED TO INTRODUCE INTO EVIDENCE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUEMENT RELATED TO THE INSURANCE POLICY ISSUED BY THE INUSRANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/1/2015. 6/1/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 29, 2015 663 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE (DOC. NO. 650 ) IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS PROFFERED TRIAL EXHIBITS ARE SUMMARIES OF BUSINESS RECORDS ADMISSIBLE UNDER THE FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 5/29/2015. 5/29/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 3, 2015 637 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT THE "ASBESTOS EXCLUSION" CONTAINED IN THE "EXCESS OVERLAYER INDEMNITY" INSURANCE POLICIES IS AMBIGUOUS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CONSTRUCTION OF THE ASBESTOS EXCLUSION THAT FAVORS INSURANCE PROTECTION FOR THE POLICYHOLDER, PLAINTIFF GRC APPLIES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/3/2015. 3/3/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 26, 2013 529 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 9/25/2013. 9/27/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 4, 2012 462 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. THE 4/27/2012 ORDER (DOC. NO. 459) ACCOMPANIES THIS MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 5/4/2012. 5/4/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 26, 2012 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY'S AND AIU INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY'S AND AIU INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER AND OPINION ENTERED ON 1/30/2012 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 4/26/2012. 4/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 20, 2012 447 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED AND CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER AND OPINION ENTERED ON 2/22/2012 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 4/19/2012. 4/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 27, 2012 433 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S LACK OF DAMAGES (DOC. #346) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 3/26/2012; 3/27/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 21, 2012 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS LISTED HEREIN ARE DENIED IN THAT EACH ONE INVOLVES TRIABLE ISSUES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 3/21/2012. 3/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 22, 2012 418 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING ARE DENIED: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS. HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY AND FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REGULATORY ISSUES. LEXINGTON INS URANCE COMPANY AND AIU INSURANCE COMPANY'S JOINDER IN HARTFORD AND FIRST STATE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REGULATORY ISSUES. CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISREGARD THE DECLARATION OF MICAHEL R. POWERS, PH.D.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 2/21/2012. 2/22/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 7, 2012 411 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 2/7/2012. 2/7/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 30, 2012 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE AS A DEFENDANT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 1/27/2012. 1/30/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 21, 2011 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 6/20/2011. 6/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY v. FIRST STATE INSURANCE CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?