DADDIO et al v. THE A.I. DUPONT HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN OF THE NEMOURS FOUNDATION et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv00441
Filed: February 1, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: BERLE M. SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794ra Rehabilitation Act of 1973
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE THE CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS (DOCUMENT NO. 224) AND THE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT COSTS OF $12,378.93 ARE TAXED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF'S FOR THE REASONS STATED IN A MEMORANDUM OF LAW BEARING TODAY'S DATE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/12/2011. 8/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
August 24, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECUSAL FILED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE (SVINDLAND DOCKET. 192; DADDIO DOCKET. 158) AND THE DEFENDANTS OPPOSITIONS THERETO, AND FOR THE REASONS STATED IN A MEMORANDUM OF LAW BEARING TODAYS DATE, IT IS ORDERED THAT MOTIONS ARE DENIED... SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/21/09. 8/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 21, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY (DOC. 129) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 201) IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED FOR DEFENDANTS ON THE PLAINTIFFS MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE AND INFORMED CONSENT CLAIMS.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/21/09. 8/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 19, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE MORTALITY DATA IS GRANTED, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IN THE SVINDLAND AND DADDIO CASES (C.A. 05-417, DOC. 147; C.A. 05-441 DOC. 130) ARE GRANTED. THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL IN THE SVINDLAND CASE (C.A. 05-417, DOC. 150) IS DENIED, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 5/18/09. 5/20/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, EMAILED.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DADDIO et al v. THE A.I. DUPONT HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN OF THE NEMOURS FOUNDATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?