BRO-TECH CORPORATION et al v. THERMAX, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv02330
Filed: May 18, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M. RUFE
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion for Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2010 613 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/14/10. 1/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc) (CONFIDENTIAL - DESIGNATED COUNSEL ONLY) (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 2/23/2010 (fdc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2010: # 1 sealdc.) (fdc, ).
September 3, 2009 516 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION (DOC #271) IS GRANTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. ACCORDINGLY, COUNTS XI AND XII OF PLFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED. THE MOTION OF DEFTS (DOC #288) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/3/09. ) 9/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 7, 2009 473 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER PROTECTING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/6/09. 5/8/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 20, 2009 454 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THERMAX'S COUNTERCLAIMS ARE DISMISSED; THERMAX'S REQUEST THAT THIS MATTER BE HEARD BY THE COURT IN A BENCH TRIAL IS DENIED. THE JURY DEMAND IN THIS ACTION REMAINS IN FORCE AS TO ALL CLAIMS THAT MAY BE TRIED BY A JURY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/19/09. 3/20/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 7, 2008 293 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY SUBPOENA AND CONDUCT TRIAL DEPOSITIONS OF THEIR THIRD-PARTY WITNESSES, SO LONG AS THEY SCHEDULE THE DEPOSITIONS ON DATES CONVENIENT TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL AS WELL. TRIAL OF THIS MATTER WILL NOT BE POSTPONED TO COMPLETE THESE DEPOSITIONS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 2/7/08. 2/7/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRO-TECH CORPORATION et al v. THERMAX, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?