MCGUFFEY v. BRINK'S, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv02840
Filed: June 14, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of MEMORANDUM/OPINION (DOC. #236) that PLAINTIFF FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY FEES RELATED TO DEFENDING HIS FEE PETITION (DOC. #229 IN 05-2480; DOC. ##103 AND 104 IN 07-2299) IS GRANTED. THE DEFENDANT BRINK'S INC., SHALL PAY. $18,040 IN ATTORNEY'S FEES TO CARMEN MATOS;.... POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST AT 2.51% ANNUALLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/10/2009. 8/11/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
February 10, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION that. PLAINTIFF JAMES MCGUFFEY'S MOTION TO MOLD THE VERDICT, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 59(e), ORDERING THE REHIRE OF MR. MCGUFFEY (DOC. #203 IN 05-2840; DOC. ##83, 84 AND 85 IN 07-2299) IS DENIED;. PLAINTIFF JAMES MCGUFF EY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HIS MOTION FOR REINSTATEMENT TO BE FILED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 52, 52(b), 58(a)(2)AND (d) AND 59(e)(Doc. #222 in 05-2840; Doc. #96 in 07-2299) IS DENIED; AND. PLAINTIFF JAMES MCGUFFEY'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS (DOC. #200 IN 05-2840; DOC. #79 IN 07-2299) IS GRANTED. BRINK'S SHALL PAY:.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/9/2009. 2/10/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
January 21, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION that DEFENDANT THE BRINK'S COMPANY PENSION-RETIREMENT PLAN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND RELATED NON-TAXABLE EXPENSES (DOC. #193) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/20/2009. 1/21/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGUFFEY v. BRINK'S, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?