COLACICCO v. APOTEX, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. COLACICCO
Defendant: APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP. and SMITHKLINE BEECHAM
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2005cv05500
Filed: October 21, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 102 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ENTIRE ACTION IS VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/8/10. 3/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 5, 2010 101 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Parties for Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (POGUST, HARRIS)
December 28, 2009 100 Featured Case ORDER THAT MOTION TO COMPEL MORE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO HIS DISCOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT APOTEX, INC. AND APOTEX CORP., AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/28/09.12/29/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(dp, )
December 15, 2009 99 Featured Case ORDER. RE: CERTAIN FACTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/15/09. 12/15/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
December 10, 2009 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AGAINST SMITHKLINE BEECHAM D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE AND TRANSFER VENUE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/10/09. 12/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
December 10, 2009 97 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/10/09. 12/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 27, 2009 96 Featured Case Audio File NOVEMBER 24, 2009. 2:00 PM, regarding ORAL ARGUMENT held on NOVEMBER 24, 2009, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (mvh, )
November 25, 2009 95 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON: Oral Argument held on 11/24/09. (fdc)
November 16, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT 1, EXHIBIT 38 AND EXHIBIT 50 TO THE DECLARATION OF THOMAS F. KLINE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/16/09.11/16/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
November 9, 2009 93 Featured Case DECLARATION EXHIBITS of Thomas F. Kline in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Federal Preemption) (Filed in Hard Copy - Document exceeds 50 pages). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 92 Featured Case DECLARATION EXHIBITS of Bernice Tao in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Federal Preemption) (Filed in Hard Copy - Document exceeds 50 pages). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 91 Featured Case DECLARATION EXHIBITS of Arthur B. Keppel in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Federal Preemption Grounds (Filed in Hard Copy - Document exceeds 50 pages). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 90 Featured Case EXHIBIT 50 to the Declaration of Thomas F. Kline in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 89 Featured Case EXHIBIT 38, Declaration of Thomas F. Kline in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 88 Featured Case EXHIBIT 1, Declaration of Thomas F. Kline in Support of Apotex Motion for Summary Judgment (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fdc)
November 9, 2009 87 Featured Case MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1, Exhibit 38 and Exhibit 50 to Declaration of Thomas Kline in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
November 9, 2009 86 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wyeth Federal Preemption) filed by APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP..Brief, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts in Support of Summary Judgment, # 2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Memo of Law Thomas Kline Declaration (Exhibits thereto filed in paper mode only), # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law Arthur Keppel Declaration (Exhibits thereto filed in paper mode only), # 5 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law Bernice Tao Declaration (Exhibits thereto filed in paper mode only))(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
October 26, 2009 85 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT SET FOR 11/24/2009 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3A BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE.(ltm, )
October 6, 2009 84 Featured Case STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/5/09. 10/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
October 5, 2009 83 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER. ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF ON THE PREEMPTION ISSUE BY 11/9/09. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/5/09. 10/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
September 28, 2009 82 Featured Case Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including B. Sherman (Canadian) through Sherman Holdings Inc. (Canadian) (47%) and B. Sherman, Trustee (Canadian) through The Bernard Sherman 2000 Trust (Canadian) (53%) - are parent corporations of Shermco Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Sherfam, Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Apotex Holdings Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc. (Canadian) (94%, 6% held by Apotex Employees (Canadian)) which is parent of Apotex Inc. (Canadian) by APOTEX, INC..(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
September 28, 2009 81 Featured Case Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including B. Sherman (Canadian) through Sherman Holdings Inc. (Canadian) (47%) and B. Sherman, Trustee (Canadian) through The Bernard Sherman 2000 Trust (Canadian) (53%) - are parent corporations of Shermco Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Sherfam, Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Apotex Holdings Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Aposherm, Inc. (Canadian), which is parent of Apotex Corporation (US) by APOTEX CORP..(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
September 22, 2009 80 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Discovery , and Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition, filed by APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP. Certificate of Service. (KEPPEL, ARTHUR) Modified on 9/23/2009 (lisad, ).
September 21, 2009 79 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE PREEMPTION DISCOVERY DEADLINE, AND EXTENSION OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE PREEMPTION ISSUE IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY ON THE ISSUE OF PREEMPTION IS EXTENDED BY 30 DAYS TO 10/30/09.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/21/09. 9/22/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
September 21, 2009 78 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/23/2009 11:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO INITIATE.(ltm, )
September 20, 2009 77 Featured Case MOTION for Protective Order filed by APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Counsel, # 3 Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D - Text of Proposed Protective Order, # 8 Certification of Service)(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
September 18, 2009 76 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on Issue of Preemption, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion/Briefs on Issue of Preemption filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO, APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Counsel Motion Uncontested, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D-L, # 7 Certificate of Service)(KEPPEL, ARTHUR)
September 15, 2009 75 Featured Case Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 74 Transcript - PDF, 9/16/09 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (fdc)
September 15, 2009 74 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Status/Case Management Hearing held on 6/18/09, before Judge Baylson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2009. (fdc, )
September 14, 2009 73 Featured Case MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Discovery filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO.Memorandum; Certificate of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certification of Counsel, # 6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
September 14, 2009 72 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Sever Claims Against SmithKline Beecham MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
September 7, 2009 71 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Sever Claims Against SmithKline Beecham MOTION to Transfer Venue , and Memorandum of Law in support of Opposition filed by APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., Certificate of Service. (KEPPEL, ARTHUR) Modified on 9/8/2009 (nd, ).
August 21, 2009 70 Featured Case MOTION to Sever Claims Against SmithKline Beecham, MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO.Memorandum, Cerificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Exhibit A(1), # 3 Exhibit A(2), # 4 Exhibit Ex B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
June 26, 2009 69 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON: Status Case Management Hearing held on 6/18/09. (fdc)
June 23, 2009 68 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF NATHAN A. GUEST, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) (PRO HAC VICE) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/23/09. 6/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 23, 2009 67 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARK S. BROWN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) (PRO HAC VICE) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/23/09.6/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 19, 2009 66 Featured Case ORDER THAT DISCOVERY ON OTHER ISSUES SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/28/10, AND ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 3/15/10. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/19/09. 6/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 18, 2009 65 Featured Case Audio File 6/18/2009, 10:00 AM, regarding STATUS/CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING held on 6/18/2009, before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (mvh, )
June 18, 2009 64 Featured Case Praecipe to file Letter by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (GIBSON, VIRGINIA) Modified on 6/18/2009 (nd, ).
June 17, 2009 63 Featured Case MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nathan Guest filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service ($40 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt #PPE2962). (O'NEIL, JOSEPH) Modified on 6/18/2009 (fdc).
June 17, 2009 62 Featured Case MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Brown filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service ($40 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt #PPE2961)). (O'NEIL, JOSEPH) Modified on 6/18/2009 (fdc).
May 29, 2009 61 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FORWARD TO CHAMBERS THE BRIEFS WHICH THEY FILED IN THE 3RD CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS, FOLLOWING THE SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN WYETH V. LEVINE, 129 S. CT. 1187 (2009). THE COURT WILL HOLD A STATUS CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING ON THURSDAY, 6/18/9 AT 3:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/29/09. 5/29/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
May 28, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TODD P. DAVIS, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) (PRO HAC VICE) ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/28/09. 5/28/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
May 21, 2009 59 Featured Case Application of Todd P. Davis, Esq. to practice in this court pursuant to LRCP 83.5.2(b) (Pro Hac Vice) on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Statement, Certificate of Service ($40 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt# PPE1374). (fdc)
May 21, 2009 58 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 52 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. Re: Order that judgment in Colacicco and McNellis is vacated and remanded to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of PA and the McNellis matter is remanded to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Court's decision. The respective parties can raise their arguments before the respective district courts. (fdc)
April 15, 2009 57 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 52 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. Re: Order that the mandate issued on 5/13/08 is hereby recalled in light of the U.S. Supreme Court's decision vacating the judgment of this Court and remanding the matter for further proceedings. (fdc)
May 21, 2008 56 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 52 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. Re: Order that the Judgment of the District Court entered 5/26/06, be and the same is hereby affirmed. (fdc)
May 14, 2008 55 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 52 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. Re: Order that the judgment of the District Court entered 5/26/06, be and the same is hereby affirmed. (fdc)
June 27, 2006 54 Featured Case Copy of TPO Form re 52 Notice of Appeal: (fdc, ) (rf, ).
June 22, 2006 Featured Case NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 52 Notice of Appeal filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO,. USCA Case Number 06-3107. (mjo, )
June 19, 2006 53 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to USCA re 52 Notice of Appeal: (jl, )
June 19, 2006 52 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 51 Memorandum & Opinion by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 929862. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and DEREK BRASLOW, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, )
May 26, 2006 51 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WILL BE GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/25/06. 5/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 17, 2006 50 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SmithKline Beecham d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline's Supplemental Reply Brief in Response to This Court's Order of May 11, 2006 filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service. (STANOCH, DAVID) Modified on 5/19/2006 (np).
May 17, 2006 49 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Opposition to the Brief for Amicus Curiae The United States of America, with accompanying exhibits filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit D1)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
May 17, 2006 48 Featured Case Supplemental Reply Brief in light of the Brief for Amicus Curiae The United States of America in Support of Motion to Dismiss Action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) on behalf of DEFENDANTS APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., Certificate of Service. (fdc)
May 11, 2006 47 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MAY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF BY CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON WEDNESDAY, 5/17/06, LIMITED TO TWENTY (20) PAGES AND TO THE PREEMPTION ISSUES RAISED IN THE AMICUS BRIEF. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/11/06. 5/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 10, 2006 46 Featured Case Addendum to Brief for Amicus Curiae by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (fdc)
May 10, 2006 45 Featured Case Brief for Amicus Curiae by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Certificate of Service. (fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2006 (fdc, ).
May 5, 2006 44 Featured Case Letter from Judge Baylson to Sharon Swingle, Esq. Re: Questions for the amicus brief. (fdc)
April 20, 2006 43 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE GOVERNMENT SHALL SUBMIT THEIR AMICUS BRIEF BY CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON WEDNESDAY, 5/10/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/19/06. 4/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc)
April 6, 2006 42 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO re 41 Memorandum, in Opposition to the Separate Renewed Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Apotex and SmithKline Beecham d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline (BRASLOW, DEREK)
April 6, 2006 41 Featured Case PLAINTIFF JOSEPH C. COLACICCO'S Memorandum in Opposition to the Separate Renewed Motions to Dismiss 5 & 10 of Defendants Apotex & SmithKline Beecham d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline w/ Certs of Service. (BRASLOW, DEREK) Modified on 4/10/2006 (fh)
March 31, 2006 40 Featured Case Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Light of Amended Complaint in Support of Motion to Dismiss Action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants Apotex, Inc. and Apotex Corporation, Certificate of Service. (fdc)
March 31, 2006 39 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss GSK's Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and in Support of GSK's Motion to Dismiss filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(STANOCH, DAVID)
March 28, 2006 37 Featured Case Letter mailed to Food and Drug Agministration requesting amicus brief. (ldb, )
March 28, 2006 36 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Motion Hearing held on 3/17/06. Re: Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (fdc)
March 27, 2006 38 Featured Case Letter from counsel (ldb, )
March 27, 2006 35 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Oral Arguments Hearing held on 3/17/06 before Judge Baylson. (fdc)
March 27, 2006 34 Featured Case Letter RE: RESPONSE in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss GSK's Second Supplemental Brief filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (STANOCH, DAVID) Modified on 3/28/2006 (np).
March 27, 2006 33 Featured Case Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint of DEFENDANTS APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., Certificate of Service. (fdc)
March 24, 2006 32 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., SMITHKLINE BEECHAM , filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO, Certificate of Service.(Attachments: # 1 part2# 2 part3# 3 part4)(fdc)
March 16, 2006 31 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERICA M. LONG, ESQ. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/15/06. 3/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (fdc) (rf, ).
March 16, 2006 30 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF S. SAMUEL GRIFFIN, ESQ. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/15/06. 3/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (fdc) (rf, ).
March 16, 2006 29 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANDREW T. BAYMAN, ESQ. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF SMITHKLINE BEECHAM IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/15/06. 3/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (fdc) (rf, ).
March 13, 2006 28 Featured Case Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint of DefendantsAPOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., Certificate of Service. (fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2006 (fdc, ).
March 13, 2006 27 Featured Case Letter Brief RE: RESPONSE in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Brief in Support of GSK's Motion to Dismiss w/ Exhibit A (note: Exhibits B and C too large to be attached to this filing) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(STANOCH, DAVID) Modified on 3/14/2006 (np).
March 13, 2006 26 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to the Separate Motions to Dismiss of Defendants' Apotex, Inc., Apotex, Corp., and SmithKline Beecham w/ accompanying exhibit and Certificates of Service filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(POGUST, HARRIS)
March 7, 2006 Featured Case Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee: (Andrew T. Bayman) $ 40.00, receipt number 926427. (fdc)
March 7, 2006 Featured Case Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee: (Erica M. Long) $ 40.00, receipt number 926426. (fdc)
March 7, 2006 Featured Case Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee (S. Samuel Griffin): $ 40.00, receipt number 926425. (fdc)
March 6, 2006 25 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Application of Erica M. Long to practice before the Court pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b).(STANOCH, DAVID)
March 6, 2006 24 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Application of Andrew T. Bayman to practice before the Court pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b).(STANOCH, DAVID)
March 6, 2006 23 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b) filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Application of S. Samuel Griffin to practice before the Court pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.2(b).(STANOCH, DAVID)
March 3, 2006 22 Featured Case AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SET FOR 3/17/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. (ltm, )
March 1, 2006 21 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. STANOCH on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM with Certificate of Service (STANOCH, DAVID)
February 28, 2006 20 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SET FOR 3/8/2006 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3B BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. (ltm, )
February 7, 2006 19 Featured Case Memorandum re 10 MOTION to Dismiss w/Exhibits filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit B)(POGUST, HARRIS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2008: # 3 o) (rf, ).
February 7, 2006 18 Featured Case Memorandum in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (POGUST, HARRIS)
February 7, 2006 17 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Statement of Undisputed Facts w/proposed order filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (POGUST, HARRIS)
February 7, 2006 16 Featured Case MOTION Consolidated Oral Argument on Defendant's Separate Motions to Dismiss re 10 MOTION to Dismiss, 5 MOTION to Dismiss w/ proposed order filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO..(POGUST, HARRIS)
January 10, 2006 15 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY (30) DAYS IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SHALL RESPOND NO LATER THAN 2/8/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/10/06. 1/10/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc) (rf, ).
December 30, 2005 14 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES A. FITZPATRICK, III on behalf of APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service (stb, )
December 29, 2005 13 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS EXTENDED UNTIL 2/8/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/28/05. 12/29/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(stb, ) (rf, ).
December 28, 2005 12 Featured Case STIPULATION re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Time Extension for Plaintiff to Respond by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (BRASLOW, DEREK) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/29/2005 (np).
December 27, 2005 11 Featured Case Memorandum of Law filed by SmithKline Beecham in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM, Certificate of Service. (SCHILLER, JOSHUA) Modified on 12/28/2005 (np).
December 26, 2005 10 Featured Case DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP..MEMORANDUM, CERT. OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Of Law)(pr, )
December 20, 2005 9 Featured Case Memorandum In Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III thru X of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
December 14, 2005 8 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. APOTEX, INC. waiver sent on 10/26/2005, answer due 12/27/2005. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
December 6, 2005 7 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL FOURTEEN (14) DAYS IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SHALL RESPOND NO LATER THAN 12/20/05. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/6/05. 12/6/05 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(fdc) (rf, ).
November 30, 2005 6 Featured Case STIPULATION re 5 MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (BRASLOW, DEREK) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/1/2005 (np).
November 22, 2005 5 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss filed by SMITHKLINE BEECHAM.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memoradum in Support# 3 Certificate of Service)(SCHILLER, JOSHUA)
November 7, 2005 4 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO re Thomas H. Volkman Served Summons & Complaint upon Jean Sherwood on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline by Personal Service on 11/02/05(BRASLOW, DEREK) Modified on 11/8/2005 (np).
November 7, 2005 3 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO re Served Summons & Complaint upon Apotex, Florida by Certified Mail on 10/31/05. (BRASLOW, DEREK) Modified on 11/8/2005 (np).
November 7, 2005 2 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO re Served Summons & Complaint upon Apotex, Canada by Certified Mail. (No Return Receipt Attached) (BRASLOW, DEREK) Modified on 11/8/2005 (np).
October 21, 2005 Featured Case DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO. (ks, )
October 21, 2005 Featured Case Summons Issued as to APOTEX, INC., APOTEX CORP., SMITHKLINE BEECHAM. Forwarded To: Counsel on October 24, 2005 (ks, )
October 21, 2005 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 922425.), filed by JOSEPH C. COLACICCO.(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLACICCO v. APOTEX, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. COLACICCO
Represented By: HARRIS L. POGUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX, INC.
Represented By: ARTHUR B. KEPPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: ARTHUR B. KEPPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM
Represented By: DAVID J. STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?