THE ESTATE OF PERRY BREWINGTON, DECEDENT v. LOMBARDO et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv06016
Filed: November 16, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: EDMUND V. LUDWIG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER DENYING PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 11/3/10. 11/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 29, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 59(a) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 9/29/10. 9/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 22, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S 9/15/2008 ORDER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR CERTIFICATION OF THAT ORDER IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDMUND V. LUDWIG ON 7/21/2009. 7/22/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF PERRY BREWINGTON, DECEDENT v. LOMBARDO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?