UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUNOCO, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv06336
Filed: December 8, 2005
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:8324 PA Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO MEMORANDUM/OR OPINION (DOC. #252) that THE UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. #249) IS GRANTED. SUNOCO MAY NOT SEEK ATTORNEYS' FEES OR COSTS FROM THE UNITED STATES UNDER THE TANK ACT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/24/2009. 8/24/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
July 15, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MEMORANDUM (DOCUMENT #245) that:. THE UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS DEFENSES (DOC. #200) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART:.... ATLANTIC RICHFIELD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (DOC. #204) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/15/2009. 7/15/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
June 11, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #240) that:. SUNOCO'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SUCCESSORSHIP (DOC. #199, FILED UNDER SEAL) IS GRANTED.. THE UNITED STATES' RENEWAL OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARYJUDGMENT ON SUCCESSORSHIP (DOC. #214) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/10/2009. 6/11/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUNOCO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?