VEZEAU, ET AL v. PFIZER, INC.
Plaintiff: CATHERINE A. BROWN and BERNARD G. VEZEAU
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2005cv06795
Filed: December 29, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CERTIFY QUESTIONS FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (DOC. NO. 126 ), IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF THESE PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED. ALL PROCEEDINGS SHALL BE STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE APPEAL. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PLACE THIS CASE IN CIVIL SUSPENSE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/22/2017. 6/22/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED AND MAILED BY CHAMBERS; E-MAILED.(amas)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS, AND ALL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF AND IN OPPOSITION THERETO IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/11/17. 4/12/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPY TO LEGAL.(jaa, )
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT DEFT PFIZER INC.,'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 42) IS GRANTED IN PART, & DENIED IN PART, CONSISTENT WITH THE MEMORANDUM FILED HEREWITH. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT IF RELATORS WISH TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THEY MUST DO SO WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/29/16. 3/2/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL: COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 2/29/16.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VEZEAU, ET AL v. PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: ADAM D. BROWN
Represented By: DOUGLAS H. HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER
Represented By: ANDREW J. HOFFMAN, II
Represented By: JOSHUA S. LEVY
Represented By: KELLY O'CONNELL
Represented By: JAYNE RISK
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Represented By: CARLTON E. WESSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE A. BROWN
Represented By: SUSAN DEIN BRICKLIN
Represented By: ROSS B. BROOKS
Represented By: JOHN ELLINGSON
Represented By: RITA L. HANSCOM
Represented By: MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: JOHN R. MININNO
Represented By: FREDERICK M. MORGAN
Represented By: RONALD J. STYKA
Represented By: ERIC L. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNARD G. VEZEAU
Represented By: SUSAN DEIN BRICKLIN
Represented By: ROSS B. BROOKS
Represented By: JOHN ELLINGSON
Represented By: RITA L. HANSCOM
Represented By: MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: JOHN R. MININNO
Represented By: FREDERICK M. MORGAN
Represented By: RONALD J. STYKA
Represented By: ERIC L. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?