ABRAHAM et al v. DIGUGLIELMO et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00058
Filed: January 6, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION FILED BY DEFTS., PLFF'S RESPONSE THERETO, AND DEFTS' REPLY, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS GERMAINE, ARIAS, AND PRISON HEALTH SERVICES, INC. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF ABRAHAM.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 6/30/11. 7/1/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, ) Modified on 7/1/2011 (afm, ).
December 10, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AND COUT III OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 12/10/10. 12/10/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
May 25, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE GRATNED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HIS SECTION 1983 CLAIMS AGAISNT PHS IS GRANTED. HE SHOULD FILE ANY SUCH AMENDMENT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 5/25/10. 5/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABRAHAM et al v. DIGUGLIELMO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?