MCDONOUGH et al v. TOYS "R" US et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00242
Filed: January 19, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 898 Opinion or Order of the Court FEE AND EXPENSE ORDER-1...CONCLUSION. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS FOR NAMED PLAINTIFFS (MCDONOUGH, 06-CV-242, ECF NO. 863, ELLIOTT, 09-CV-6151, ECF NO. 153) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. CLASS COUNSEL ARE AWARDED ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,090,833.33 TO BE PAID FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND. CLASS COUNSEL ARE AWARDED EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,283.482.10, TO BE PAID FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND. CLASS REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS ARE AWARDED INCENTIVE AWARDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,500 EACH, TO BE PAID FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND..... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/21/2015. 1/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
December 21, 2011 792 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT SUBCLASSES - WHEREAS, THE PLAINTIFFS, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND EACH CLASS MEMBER, BY AND THROUGH THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD, HAVE ASSERTED CLAIMS FOR DAMAGES ALLEGING VIOLATIONS OF THE SHERMAN ACT,.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/20/2011. 12/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
June 13, 2011 758 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #757) FOR THE REASONS EXPLAINED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, IT IS ORDERED that PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AGAINST REGAL LAGER (MCDONOUGH ECF NO. 725; ELLIOTT ECF NO. 63) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART:. PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO ENFORCE THE TERMS OF THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS GRANTED..... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/13/2011. 6/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
July 15, 2009 586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MEMORANDUM (DOC #585) that. CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DOC. #463)IS GRANTED CONSISTENT WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER.. COUNTS II, III, AND IV IN THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATE CLAS S ACTION COMPLAINT (DOC. #340) ARE DIMISSED AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS1(footnote);... THE DEFENDANTS MAY FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE BY AUGUST 28,2009.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/15/2009. 7/15/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDONOUGH et al v. TOYS "R" US et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?