IN RE: MUSHROOM DIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION

Case Number: 2:2006cv00620
Filed: February 10, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 813 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF ENTITLEMENT TO IMMUNITY FROM PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS UNDER PARAGRAPH 1 OF THE SHERMAN ACT AND FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S 3/2/09 OPINION IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT THAT IS SEEKS SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN DEFENDANTS' FAVOR WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST JOHN PIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/6/17. 3/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 22, 2017 809 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DISMISSAL OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE DIVERSIFIED FOODS & SEASONINGS, INC. [DKT.NO.787] IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 2/22/17. 2/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 5, 2015 741 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/5/15. 10/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
August 27, 2015 724 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/27/15. 8/27/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
August 20, 2015 713 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/20/15. 8/20/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
August 5, 2015 704 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/5/15. 8/5/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
July 29, 2015 694 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/29/15. 7/29/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
May 26, 2015 671 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 5/26/15. 5/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(fdc)
October 14, 2014 609 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RECONSIDERATION [#513] IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT THAT IT SEEKS RECONSIDERATION OF MY DECISION OF MARCH 26, 2009. THIS ORDER DENYING RECONSIDERATION OF MY DECISION OF MY DECISION OF MARCH 26, 2009 IS CERTIFIED FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1292(B) BECAUSE IT INVOLVES CONTROLLING QUESTIONS OF LAW AS TO WHICH THERE IS SUBSTANTIAL GROUND FOR DIFFERENCE OF OPINION AND BECAUSE AN IMMEDIATE APPEAL FROM THIS ORDER MAY MATERIALLY ADVANCE THE ULTIMATE TERMINATION OF THE LITIGATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/14/14. 10/14/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 22, 2012 473 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS OF M.D. BASCIANI AND BFI ARE OVERRULED AND THE ORDER DATED 8/21/12 IS AFFIRMED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/12. 10/22/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.[fdc]
January 31, 2012 400 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AND BFI'S MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/31/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 26, 2009 294 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD EXEMPTION FILED BY THE EMMC, THE MUSHROOM ALLIANCE, INC., KITHCEN PRIDE MUSHROOMS AND, M.D. BASCIANI & SONS, INC., JM FARMS, FRANKLIN FARMS, INC. ARE DENIED. P LAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY IS GRANTED. ALL OTHER MOTIONS TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS UNRELATED TO CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/26/09. 3/26/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: MUSHROOM DIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?